Roberson v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Roberson
Defendant: Albert Smith, Willows Police Department, City of Willows, County of Glenn and People of the State of California
Case Number: 2:2017cv02649
Filed: December 20, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Solano
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 04/10/19 ORDERING the Clerk of the Court assign a District Court Judge to this case. Also, RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 14 days. (Plummer, M)
February 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/21/2019 DISMISSING 18 Amended Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days from the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/3/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Kenneth Wayne Roberson. The Glenn County Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: Financial Department)(Henshaw, R)
January 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 1/3/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the require fees of $400. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Roberson v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Wayne Roberson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albert Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willows Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Willows
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Glenn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: People of the State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?