Springfield v. Khalit et al
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Defendant: M. Khalit, Brady, T. Lindquist and A. Denneg
Case Number: 2:2017cv02675
Filed: December 22, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Los Angeles
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/17/2019 ADOPTED in FULL 11 Findings and Recommendations, and Plaintiff' claims alleging denial of access to the courts and violation of due process are DISMISSED. (Reader, L)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/18/2019 DISMISSING 18 Second Amended Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days. (Henshaw, R)
February 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/6/19 ORDERING that the Clerk is directed to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's 1/30/19 motion for extension of time (ECF No. 14 ) on Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica An derson and the Warden of the California Medical Facility, P.O. Box 2000, Vacaville, California, 95696-2000; and Within ten days of the date of this order, the Warden of the California Medical Facility shall inform the court of the status of plaintiff's access to his legal property.(Becknal, R)
December 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 12/26/18 GRANTING 12 Motion for Extension of Time; Plaintiff has 30 days to file an amended complaint. (Benson, A.)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 11/14/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 10 motion requesting that the court order prison officials to return funds to his trust account and DISMISSING plaintiff' ;s retaliation claim with 30 days to file a second amended complaint; and the Clerk shall appoint a district judge to this action. IT IS RECOMMENDED that plaintiff's claims alleging denial of access to the courts and violation of due process be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge John A. Mendez; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
January 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/24/2018 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Ciron B. Springfield. The Director of the CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Springfield v. Khalit et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ciron B. Springfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Khalit
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brady
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Lindquist
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Denneg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?