United States of America v. Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Case Number: 2:2017mc00179
Filed: November 21, 2017
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Drug Related Seizure of Property
Cause of Action: Civil Miscellaneous Case
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CONSENT JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE dated *12/11/2018* pursuant to order signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/10/2018. (Washington, S)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 10/22/18 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture is EXTENDED to 12/21/2018. (Kastilahn, A)
August 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/22/18: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to October 22, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
August 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/6/2018 ORDERING that the deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be EXTENDED to 8/22/2018. (Reader, L)
May 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/30/18: The deadline by which the United States shall be required to file a complaint for forfeiture against the defendant currency and/or to obtain an indictment alleging that the defendant currency is subject to forfeiture shall be extended to July 23, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/27/2018 ORDERING that time for the USA to File a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture is EXTENDED to 5/22/2018. (Washington, S)
January 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 1/18/2018 GRANTING and Extension of Time for Filing a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture until 3/23/2018(Hunt, G)
December 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 12/05/17 ORDERING that time for the USA to File a Complaint for Forfeiture and/or to Obtain an Indictment Alleging Forfeiture is EXTENDED to 01/22/18. (Benson, A.)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $10,000.00 in U.S. Currency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?