Tucker v. Warden

Petitioner: Gregory Allen Tucker
Respondent: Warden
Case Number: 2:2018cv00035
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
October 29, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/29/18 GRANTING 21 Motion for Extension. Plaintiff is GRANTED 30 days from the date of this order to file and serve his opposition to 17 Motion to Dismiss. (Coll, A)
May 10, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/10/18 GRANTING 11 Motion to Stay. Within 30 days from the date the California Supreme Court issue a final order resolving the unexhausted claims, petitioner shall file in this court a motion to lift the stay. The clerk of the court is directed to administratively terminate this action. (Plummer, M)
March 7, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 03/07/18 GRANTING 6 Motion to Proceed IFP. Petitioner is granted thirty days in which to file a motion for stay; if he seeks a stay under Rhines, petitioner must address each of the required elements: (1) the petitioner had good cause for his failure to exhaust, (2) his unexhausted claims are potentially meritorious, and (3) there is no indication that the petitioner engaged in intentionally dilatory litigation tactics. (Plummer, M)
January 22, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/22/2018 ORDERING Petitioner to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, an affidavit in support of his request to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. If Petitioner intended his filing for the California Supreme Court, he may file a request to voluntarily dismiss this action. (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tucker v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gregory Allen Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?