Mendez Jimenez v. University of California et al

Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Mendez Jimenez
Defendant: University of California, Board of Regents of the University of California and University of California Davis Medical Center
Case Number: 2:2018cv00044
Filed: January 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J. Newman
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury- Medical Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 27, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER OF NON-RELATED CASES signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/27/2018 ACCORDINGLY Case 2:18-CV-2081 TLN KJN, shall not be reassigned to the undersigned judge. 19 (Reader, L)(Reader, L)
May 9, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/9/2018 ORDERING that the Consolidated Complaint is deemed filed with the signing of this order. (Fabillaran, J)
March 15, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION AND ORDER CONSOLIDATING CASES signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 3/14/18. Lead Case is 2:18-CV-00044-JAM-KJN, Member Case 2:17-cv-01914 JAM KJN; MEMBER CASE CLOSED; All future filing to be made in Case 2:18-CV-00044-JAM-KJN. (Mena-Sanchez, L) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mendez Jimenez v. University of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luis Alberto Mendez Jimenez
Represented By: Douglas L. Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California
Represented By: Neal Christopher Lutterman
Represented By: Bianca S. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of California
Represented By: Neal Christopher Lutterman
Represented By: Bianca S. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University of California Davis Medical Center
Represented By: Neal Christopher Lutterman
Represented By: Bianca S. Samuel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?