Shekarlab v. County of Sacramento et al

Plaintiff: Ramin Shekarlab
Defendant: County of Sacramento, Robert Padilla, Charles Kim, Manjeet Kaur, Joyce Amajor and Kathryn Gonzales
Case Number: 2:2018cv00047
Filed: January 9, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 6, 2018 35 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/3/2018 ADDING attorney Bruce Alan Kilday for Kathryn Gonzales, in place of attorney Robert L. Chalfant. (Washington, S)
May 10, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/9/2018 DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims for punitive damages on his state law claims as to all Defendants for the reasons set forth in this order. (Fabillaran, J)
April 26, 2018 26 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/25/18, GRANTING Defendant's 16 Motion to Dismiss, without prejudice. Plaintiff is ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE as to why his claims for punitive damages against the other Defendants should not also be dismissed, as to the state claims identified above. Plaintiff's brief is due one week from the date of this order. Defendants may file a response to Plaintiff's brief no later than one week thereafter. (Kastilahn, A)
March 22, 2018 23 Opinion or Order of the Court STATUS PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Judge John A. Mendez on 03/21/2018 ORDERING that all Dispositive Motions filed by 06/18/2019 and heard 07/16/2019 at 1:30 p.m.; Discovery completed by 04/17/2019; joint mid-litigation statements due 14 day s prior to close of discovery; Designation of Expert Witnesses due by 02/01/2019 with any supplemental/rebuttal expert disclosures due by 02/15/2019; Final Pretrial Conference set for 08/30/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez with a joint pretrial statement due 7 days prior; Jury Trial set for 10/28/2019 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before Judge John A. Mendez. Objections due within 7 days. (Fabillaran, J)
February 26, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/23/2018 ORDERING that Defendant Robert Padilla shall file a responsive pleading on or before March 26, 2018. (Becknal, R)
February 9, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/9/2018 EXTENDING Time on or before 2/23/2018 for County of Sacramento to file Answer to 1 Complaint. (York, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shekarlab v. County of Sacramento et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramin Shekarlab
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charles Kim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjeet Kaur
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joyce Amajor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Gonzales
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?