Rivera et al v. Cater et al

Plaintiff: Sierra Rivera, BA, Misty Rivera and Jim Attaway
Defendant: Andrew Cater, Bao Mai, Scott Jones and County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2018cv00056
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 11, 2018 30 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM AND ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 7/11/18 ORDERING that defendants' Motion to Dismiss 26 be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED as follows: With regard to Plaintiffs' third cause of action, the court GRANTS the Motion to Dismiss, but solely to the extent the claim is premised on direct liability. With regard to Plaintiffs' fifth cause of action, the court GRANTS defendants' Motion to Dismiss. Plaintiffs' first, second, fourth, and sixth claims remain, as does the third claim, to the extent that it is not premised on direct liability. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
April 4, 2018 17 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM and ORDER re Defendants' 13 Motion to Dismiss signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/4/2018: IT IS ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss the fifth and sixth claims of plaintiffs' Complaint be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED; AND IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that defendants' Motion to Dismiss the first, second, third, fourth, and seventh claims of plaintiffs' Complaint be, and the same hereby is, DENIED. Plaintiffs have twenty days from the date this Order is signed to file a First Amended Complaint, if they can do so consistent with this Order. (Kirksey Smith, K)
February 6, 2018 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 2/6/2018 ORDERING Defendant's response deadline is EXTENDED to 2/20/2018. (Washington, S)
January 23, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 1/22/2018 GRANTING 5 Petition for order appointing Misty Rivera as Guardian ad Litem for BA. (Hunt, G)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rivera et al v. Cater et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sierra Rivera
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BA
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Misty Rivera
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Attaway
Represented By: Stewart Lee Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Cater
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bao Mai
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Jones
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Robert L. Chalfant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?