Bustamante v. Spearman et al
Plaintiff: Miguel Adolfo Bustamante
Defendant: M. E. Spearman, T. Foss, N. Albonico, V. Zumpano, M. Lee, M. Chappeiu, A. Smith and J. Schuster
Case Number: 2:2018cv00057
Filed: January 10, 2018
Court: U.S. District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER and WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM ISSUED signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/08/22 ORDERING the Custodian to produce by telephonic conferencing Miguel Adolfo Bustamante on 5/17/22 at 10:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Jerem y Peterson. The custodian is ordered to notify the court of any change in custody of this inmate and is ordered to provide the new custodian with a copy of this writ. The clerk of court shall serve a copy of this order and writ on the Custodian. (cc: JDP)(Plummer, M)
March 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 03/21/22 ORDERING the stay of proceedings imposed on September 14, 2021, is extended through the date of the settlement conference set before Hon. Jeremy D. Peterson on May 17, 2022.(Plummer, M)
March 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 3/3/2022 SETTING a Settlement Conference for 5/17/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson. No later than 5/10/2022, each party must submit a confidential Settlement Conference Statement to Magistrate Judge Peterson. (Huang, H)
September 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 09/13/21. Any motion to opt out of the Post-screening ADR Project shall be filed within 30 days from the date of this order. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (Plummer, M)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 8/3/2021 DENYING defendant's 43 motion to stay proceedings and GRANTING plaintiff's 46 motion to modify the schedule. The parties may conduct discovery until 1/3/2022. Any motions necessary to compel discovery shall be filed within 60 days from this date. Dispositive motions shall be filed by 5/9/2022. (Yin, K)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 4/30/2021 GRANTING defendants' unopposed 33 motion to compel. Plaintiff shall serve written responses to Defendants' discovery requests and produce responsive documents within 30 days. Plaintiff is cautioned that failure to comply may result in the imposition of sanctions, including terminating sanctions. (Yin, K)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 3/11/21 ADOPTING in full 35 , 36 Findings and Recommendations and DENYING 31 , 32 plaintiff's motions for injunctive relief. (Kastilahn, A)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 1/5/2021 DENYING, as moot, defendant's 30 first motion for modification of the discovery schedule; and GRANTING defendant's 34 second motion for modification of the discovery sche dule. The parties may conduct discovery, including defendant's deposition of plaintiff, until 5/31/2021. Motions to compel shall be filed within 60 days thereafter. Dispositive motions shall be filed within 90 days from the cut-off date specified in this order. Discovery is otherwise closed. (Yin, K)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/03/19 DENYING 16 Motion for leave to amend. Plaintiff may file a third amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. If no third amended complaint is filed, this action shall proceed on the second amended complaint filed on September 19, 2019. (Plummer, M)
September 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 9/20/2019 ORDERING Clerk of Court to randomly assign a District Judge and update the docket to reflect the new case number. This case has been assigned to Senior Judge William B. Shubb and Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-0057 WBS DMC (PC). (Henshaw, R)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 08/16/19 ORDERING that plaintiff may file a first amended complaint within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Plummer, M)
March 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 3/18/2019 DISMISSING 1 Complaint with leave to amend within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 03/13/18 GRANTING 2 Motion to Proceed IFP. Plaintiff is obligated to pay the statutory filing fee of $350.00 for this action. Also, DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Miguel Adolfo Bustamante. CDC is to collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDC. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDC Director and Financial). (Plummer, M)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bustamante v. Spearman et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miguel Adolfo Bustamante
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. E. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Foss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: N. Albonico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: V. Zumpano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Chappeiu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Schuster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?