Carter v. Asuncion

Petitioner: Dewayne Norman Carter
Respondent: Debbie Asuncion
Case Number: 2:2018cv00078
Filed: January 12, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sutter
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
March 26, 2018 15 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/26/2018 GRANTING 14 Motion to Substitute Counsel. Attorney Eric Martin Weaver for Dewayne Norman Carter added. (cc: FPD) (Henshaw, R)
March 8, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/8/2018 APPOINTING the Federal Defender to represent petitioner. The Clerk shall serve a copy of the petition and this order on the Federal Defender. A Status Conference is set for 5/16/2018 at 10: 00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. Seven days prior to the conference, the parties shall file a joint status report, which addresses the matters listed within this order. The Clerk shall serve a copy of this order, the form Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge, and a copy of the petition on Tami Krenzin, Deputy AG. (cc: FD-Habeas Unit, Tami Krenzin)(Yin, K)
March 1, 2018 9 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 3/1/2018 DENYING without prejudice 7 Request for Appointment of Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
February 7, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/6/2018 DIRECTING to petitioner to submit an IFP form or pay the appropriate filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Fabillaran, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carter v. Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Dewayne Norman Carter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Debbie Asuncion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?