Loyer v. Spearman
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Respondent: Marlon Spearman, Jr.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00210
Filed: January 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Lassen
Presiding Judge: Craig M. Kellison
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 8/30/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed, without prejudice, for lack of prosecution and failure to comply with court rules and orders. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr.; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 7/24/2018 DENYING 9 Motion to Amend and DISMISSING 10 First Amended Complaint and 11 Second Amended Complaint. Plaintiff may file a third amended complaint within 30 days of the date of this order. (Henshaw, R)
May 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Craig M. Kellison on 5/15/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a compete application for leave to proceed IFP or the appropriate filing fee. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyer v. Spearman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clifford C. Loyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Marlon Spearman, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?