Humes v. State of California et al

Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Defendant: State of California, Sex and Arson Registry and Xavier Baccara
Case Number: 2:2018cv00244
Filed: February 2, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 11, 2018 22 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/10/2018 ADOPTING 7 findings and recommendations in full. All Defendants other than Defendant Becerra in his official capacity as the Attorney General of the State of California are DISMISSED. All claims other than Plaintiff's claim arising under the Due Process Clause of the Fourteenth Amendment for injunctive relief are DISMISSED. (Zignago, K.)
August 14, 2018 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 08/14/18 ORDERING that within 30 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of non-opposition. (Plummer, M)
May 15, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/15/2018 DENYING plaintiff's 10 motion. (Yin, K)
April 13, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jon Humes signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/13/18. The Sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sex and Arson Registry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Baccara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?