United States of America v. Real Property Located at 2040 Solano Way, Oakland, CA et. al.

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2040 Solano Way, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 020-0109-006-3, Real Property located at 925 East 11th Street, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 019-0017-003, Real Property located at 832-836 7th Avenue, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 019-0011-016, 2013 Mastercraft X-Star Wakeboard Boat, VIN: MBCSLDD0K213, California Vessel Number: CF 4080 RV, Approximately $7,286.14 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 3367633756, Approximately $7,129.51 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 819151536, Approximately $12,218.09 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 928009591 and Yaniv Gohar
Case Number: 2:2018cv00305
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Garland E. Burrell
Nature of Suit: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1345
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 17, 2018 44 Opinion or Order of the Court DEFAULT JUDGMENT AND FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORFEITURE signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 8/16/18: The Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations are adopted herein. Yaniv Gohar, Eran Berkovich and United Home SF, Inc. are held in default. (Kaminski, H)
July 30, 2018 43 Opinion or Order of the Court FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/30/18 RECOMMENDING that Yaniv Gohar, Eran Berkovich and United Home SF, Inc. be held in default; that the 40 Ex Parte Motion for Default Judgment be granted and that judgm ent by default be entered against any right, title, or interest of potential claimants Yaniv Gohar, Eran Berkovich and United Home SF, Inc. in the defendant assets referenced in this case; that a final judgment be entered, forfeiting all right, tit le, and interest in the defendant assets to the United States, to be disposed of according to law; and that the Default Judgment and Final Judgment of Forfeiture lodged be signed by the Honorable Garland E. Burrell, Jr. and filed by the Clerk of the Court. (Benson, A.)
July 18, 2018 42 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 7/17/18: The deadline to file a Joint Status Report currently due on July 26, 2018 is extended to September 27, 2018. (Kaminski, H)
June 15, 2018 33 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr on 6/14/2018 GRANTING 24 Motion for Interlocutory Sale of Defendant Real Properties and VACATING the 6/25/2018 hearing on motion. (Hunt, G)
May 8, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Garland E. Burrell, Jr. on 5/7/2018 GRANTING the United States' Request to extend the deadline to file a Joint Status Report; Status Report due 7/26/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
February 15, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR PUBLICATION signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 2/14/2018. (Zignago, K.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located at 2040 Solano Way, Oakland, CA et. al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Christopher Khasigian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located at 2040 Solano Way, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 020-0109-006-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 925 East 11th Street, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 019-0017-003
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property located at 832-836 7th Avenue, Oakland, California, Alameda County, APN: 019-0011-016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 2013 Mastercraft X-Star Wakeboard Boat, VIN: MBCSLDD0K213, California Vessel Number: CF 4080 RV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7,286.14 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 3367633756
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $7,129.51 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 819151536
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Approximately $12,218.09 Seized from JP Morgan Chase, Account Number 928009591
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yaniv Gohar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?