Lane v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al

Plaintiff: Kevin Lane
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. and Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Case Number: 2:2018cv00310
Filed: February 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Referring Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 21, 2018 18 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 09/20/18 DENYING 17 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice as having been rendered moot; the 10/26/18 hearing is VACATED; RECOMMENDING that this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Benson, A.)
July 13, 2018 16 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 07/12/18 GRANTING 7 Motion to Dismiss with 28 days LEAVE to AMEND. (Benson, A.)
April 2, 2018 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 3/30/2018. Within 14 days, Plaintiff shall show cause in writing as to why this case should not be dismissed. (Fabillaran, J)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lane v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Lane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: D. Dennis La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Federal Home Loan Mortgage Corporation
Represented By: D. Dennis La
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?