(PS) City of Sacramento v. Altstatt
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Defendant: Daniel James Altstatt
Case Number: 2:2018cv00333
Filed: February 12, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2019 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Kastilahn, A)
January 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 1/2/19 ADOPTING #16 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS and GRANTING Defendant's #3 motion to remand this case to Sacramento Superior Court. Certified copy of remand order sent to other court. CASE CLOSED (Kastilahn, A)
December 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gregory G. Hollows* from the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan* for all further proceedings. (Washington, S)
December 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #17 Order Reassigning Retired or Senior Magistrate Judge, served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Washington, S)
November 6, 2018 Filing 16 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 11/6/18 RECOMMENDING that #3 Motion to Remand be Granted and the case remanded to the Sacramento Superior Court where it still pends. Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations.(Coll, A)
November 6, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #16 Findings and Recommendations served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Coll, A)
August 20, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of claim by Daniel James Altstatt (Reader, L)
July 25, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE by Daniel James Altstatt re #12 NOTICE OF RULING. (Kaminski, H)
July 19, 2018 Filing 13 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE., attorney Adrian Alicia-Racquel Carpenter terminated (Israel, Aaron) Modified on 7/19/2018 (Benson, A.).
July 18, 2018 Filing 12 NOTICE OF RULING by All Plaintiffs. (Israel, Aaron)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/26/18, ORDERING that the Motion to Consolidate #7 is DENIED without prejudice to its resolution before the lowest numbered judge. The Motion to Remand #3 is VACATED from calendar pending a resolution of the consolidation motions. (Kastilahn, A)
April 27, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Kastilahn, A)
April 17, 2018 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT ONLY) by CRD for Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 04/17/2018: The parties are here by instructed to disregard the previous Minute Order 8 . Plaintiffs are instructed to re-notice the Motion to Remand #3 before the assigned Magistrate Judge, Gregory G. Hollows. Defendant is also instructed to notice his Motion to Consolidate Cases #7 , before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. Parties can obtain available hearings dates by contacting Jonathan Anderson at: janderson@caed.uscourts.gov or access that information on the court website at www.caed.uscourts.gov. (Anderson, J)
April 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Minute Order,, served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Anderson, J)
April 12, 2018 Filing 9 REPLY by City of Sacramento in support of #3 Motion to Remand. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Israel, Aaron) Modified on 4/13/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
April 11, 2018 Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Streeter for Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 4/11/2018: On the Courts motion, the hearing regarding Plaintiffs Motion to Remand (ECF No. #3 ), scheduled for 4/19/2018, is hereby VACATED. Plaintiffs are instructed to re-notice this motion before the assigned District Judge, Morrison C. England, Jr. Defendant is also instructed to notice his Motion to Consolidate Cases (ECF No. #7 ), before District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Parties can obtain available hearings dates by contacting Stephanie Deutsch at: sdeutsch@caed.uscourts.gov or access that information on the court website at www.caed.uscourts.gov. (Streeter, J)
April 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 8 Minute Order served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Streeter, J)
April 4, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to CONSOLIDATE CASES by Daniel James Altstatt. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2018 Filing 6 OPPOSITION by Daniel James Altstatt to #3 Motion to Remand. (Kaminski, H)
April 4, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of Claim of Subrogation and Substitution by Surety by Daniel James Altstatt. (York, M)
March 15, 2018 Filing 4 AMENDED #3 PROOF of SERVICE by City of Sacramento (Israel, Aaron) Modified on 3/16/2018 (Hunt, G).
March 14, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to REMAND by City of Sacramento. Attorney Israel, Aaron Michael added. Motion Hearing set for 4/19/2018 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (GGH) before Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. (Attachments: #1 Notice, #2 Declaration, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Request for Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9)(Israel, Aaron) Modified on 3/15/2018 (Hunt, G).
February 12, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kaminski, H)
February 12, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Sacramento County Superior Court, Case number 34-2015-00184866 filed by Daniel James Altstatt. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kaminski, H)
February 12, 2018 RECEIPT number #CAE200087990 $400.00 by Daniel J. Altstatt on 2/12/2018. (Kaminski, H)
February 12, 2018 SERVICE OVER THE COUNTER: #2 Civil New Case Documents for MCE, served on Daniel James Altstatt. (Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) City of Sacramento v. Altstatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of Sacramento
Represented By: Adrian Alicia-Racquel Carpenter
Represented By: Aaron Michael Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel James Altstatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?