Blueford v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: James Blueford
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv00342
Filed: February 13, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Disability Insurance
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
April 26, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER to SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/25/2018 GRANTING 7 Motion for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant and DIRECTING Plaintiff to complete service by Monday, 6/25/2018. (York, M)
April 18, 2018 6 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/18/2018. Plaintiff to file pleading no later than 4/27/2018. Plaintiff's filing of a proof of service upon defendant will be deemed good cause shown. (Fabillaran, J)
February 14, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 2/12/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's Request to Proceed IFP 2 is GRANTED; The Clerk of the Court is directed to serve the scheduling order in social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is fu rther directed to serve a copy of this order on the USM. Within fourteen days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons and copies of the complaint and file a statement with the court that said documents have been submitted to the USM.(Mena-Sanchez, L)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blueford v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Blueford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?