Brooks v. Lee et al
Plaintiff: Rodney Brooks
Defendant: S. Lee and E. Arnold
Case Number: 2:2018cv00374
Filed: February 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Presiding Judge: William B. Shubb
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 4/1/2021 ADOPTING 54 The Findings and Recommendations in full; GRANTING IN PART 38 Defendant S. Lee's Motion to Dismiss, and all claims against him are DISMISSED; Defendant S. Lees Motion is DENIED in all other respects; and Plaintiff is GRANTED sixty days from the date of this order to file an amended complaint. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 54 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Jeremy D. Peterson on 2/18/2021 RECOMMENDING 38 Motion to Dismiss be granted in part and all claims against defendant S. Lee be dismissed, defendant S. Lee's Motion be denied in all oth er respects; and Plaintiff be granted 60 days from the date of any order adopting these findings and recommendations to file an amended complaint. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days of service of these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 08/03/20 ORDERING that, within 21 days of the date of this order, plaintiff shall file either an opposition to the motion to dismiss or a statement of no opposition. (Plummer, M)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 7/24/19 GRANTING Plaintiff's request 27 for an extension of time and plaintiff has 30 days from the date this order is served to return the completed USM-285 form with new instructions for service on defendant Lee.(Becknal, R)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 6/25/2019 ADOPTING 21 Findings and Recommendations in full and DISMISSING Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Arnold without prejudice. (Huang, H)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/29/2019 RECOMMENDING Plaintiff's claims against Defendant Arnold be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge William B. Shubb. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Rodney Brooks signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/14/2019. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to t he Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
February 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 2/21/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to file the application required by § 1915(a) within 30 days from the date of service of this order. If plaintiff continues to experience delay in obtaining his certified trust account statement, he may submit his application without it. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brooks v. Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E. Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?