Yardstash Solutions, LLC v. Marketfleet, Inc.
Plaintiff: Yardstash Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Marketfleet, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00385
Filed: February 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Butte
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT dated *8/2/19* against Marketfleet signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 8/1/19. CASE CLOSED. (Coll, A)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 5/31/19 ORDERING that the action denominated 2:18-cv-02465-JAM-CKD is reassigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Allison Claire, and the caption shall read 2:18-cv-02465-TLN-AC. Any dates currently set in 2:18-cv-02465-JAM-CKD are hereby VACATED, and the parties are ordered to refile any pending motions before this Court. The Clerk of the Court is to issue the Initial Pretrial Scheduling Order. (Becknal, R)
March 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 3/16/18, ORDERING that the hearings on the Motions (ECF No. 52 , 53 , 54 ) are CONTINUED to 5/3/2018 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 2 (TLN) before District Judge Troy L. Nunley. (Kastilahn, A)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yardstash Solutions, LLC v. Marketfleet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yardstash Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Matthew John Faust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marketfleet, Inc.
Represented By: Ignacio Bellver, PHV
Represented By: Anthony Gerard Smyth, NCAED
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?