Bledsoe v. San Joaquin County Jail et al

Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Defendant: San Joaquin County Jail, Michell, Christen and Leatuge
Case Number: 2:2018cv00504
Filed: March 8, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 14, 2018 11 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/13/18 ORDERING that Plaintiff's 6/29/18 Motion for Reconsideration 9 , 10 is DENIED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 21, 2018 5 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/18/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 19, 2018 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 03/16/18 ORDERING if plaintiff is incarcerated, he shall submit, within thirty days from the date of thisorder, a certified copy of his inmate trust account statement for the six-month period immedi atelypreceding the filing of the complaint. If plaintiff is not incarcerated, he shall submit, within thirty days from the date of thisorder, a completed non-prisoner application in support of his request to proceed in forma pauperison the form provided by the Clerk of Court. The Clerk of the Court is directed to send plaintiff a new non-prisoner Application toProceed In Forma Pauperis.(Plummer, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bledsoe v. San Joaquin County Jail et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donnell Bledsoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Joaquin County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leatuge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?