McMillan v. Capland et al

Plaintiff: Edwin McMillan
Defendant: J. Capland and J. Crawford
Case Number: 2:2018cv00523
Filed: March 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Edmund F. Brennan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 5/23/2019 VACATING 7 Findings and Recommendations and GRANTING 8 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall file an amended complaint within 30 days from the date of this order. Absent plaintiff's filing of a notice of voluntary dismissal, failure to so comply will result in another recommendation of dismissal. (Huang, H)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 4/30/2019 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a US District Judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge William B. Shubb; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
March 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Edmund F. Brennan on 3/14/2019 DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Edwin McMillan. The custodial agency shall collect an initial partial filing fee and monthly payments in accordance with this order until the filing fee of $350 is paid in full. (cc: CDCR and Financial Department) (Henshaw, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McMillan v. Capland et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Capland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Crawford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin McMillan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?