Croghan v. Branion et al.

Plaintiff: Donald Lee Croghan
Defendant: K. Branion and G. Manguia
Case Number: 2:2018cv00529
Filed: March 7, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Joaquin
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
August 27, 2018 10 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/27/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district court judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
July 13, 2018 8 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Donald Lee Croghan signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/12/2018. CDCR shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forw ard to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Director of CDCR. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: CDCR, Financial) (Yin, K)
March 12, 2018 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE TO SACRAMENTO DIVISION signed by Magistrate Judge Michael J. Seng on 3/12/2018. New Case Number 2:18-cv-00529-CKD (PC). Old Case Number 1:18-cv-00322-MJS (PC). (Jessen, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Croghan v. Branion et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donald Lee Croghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Branion
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G. Manguia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?