I.F. et al v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: I.F., R.F., Paula McGowan and Ronell Foster, Sr.
Defendant: City of Vallejo and Ryan McMahon
Case Number: 2:2018cv00673
Filed: March 27, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/9/19 ORDERING that the deposition of Defendant Ryan McMahon is STAYED and the case management and trial dates are CONTINUED as follows: Expert disclosures due 3/4/2020, Rebuttal exp ert disclosures due 3/25/2020, Discovery due 5/27/2020, Dispositive Motions filed by 6/30/2020, hearing on dispositive motions is 7/28/2020 at 1:30 p.m.. Pretrial Conference is set for 10/16/2020 at 10:00 AM, and the Trial is set for 12/7/2020 at 09:00 AM, BOTH in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. A joint pretrial statement shall be filed no later than 10/9/2020. A joint Status Report shall be filed on or before 4/20/2020. (Kastilahn, A)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/12/2019 GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART 27 Motion for Compel Discovery. Within 7 days of this order, defendants shall produce the documents in Officer Ryan McMahon's personnel file, in accordance with the protective order(ECF No. 21 ): the Field Training Manual; the SB 719 Pursuit Policy Training Attestation, and the Internal Investigation from 2019. (Reader, L)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STIPULATION AND ORDER TO MODIFY PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/30/19. MODIFYING the case management and trial dates as follows: Disclosure of Expert Witnesses RESET to 11/4/19; Rebuttal expert disclosures RESET to 11/25/19; Joint Statement RESET to 12/20/19; Close of Discovery RESET to 1/27/20; Filing of Dispositive Motions RESET to 2/25/20; Hearing on dispositive motions RESET to 3/24/20 at 01:30 PM; Pretrial Conference RESET to 5/1/20 at 10:00 AM; and Trial RESET to 8/3/20 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Becknal, R)
February 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/27/19. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: I.F. et al v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: I.F.
Represented By: Patrick Matthew Buelna
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: R.F.
Represented By: Patrick Matthew Buelna
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paula McGowan
Represented By: Patrick Matthew Buelna
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronell Foster, Sr.
Represented By: Patrick Matthew Buelna
Represented By: John L. Burris
Represented By: Adante Pointer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?