Anderson et al v. Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Edward Anderson, Raymond Keith Corum, Jesse Worthington and Colleen Worthington
Defendant: Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P., The Jones Financial Companies, LLLP, EDJ Holding Company, Inc., James D. Weddle, Penelope Pennington, Daniel J. Timm, Kenneth R. Cella, Jr., Brett A. Campbell, Kevin D. Bastien, Norman L. Eaker, Vincent J. Ferrari, Timothy J. Kirley, James A. Tricarico, Jr., Olive Street Investment Advisors, LLC, Passport Holdings, LLC and Passport Research, LTD.
Case Number: 2:2018cv00714
Filed: March 30, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: John A. Mendez
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities/Exchanges
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 86 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 6/27/2022 SETTING Briefing Schedule re Motion to Dismiss as follows: Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed by 7/19/2022. Defendant's reply shall be filed on 8/12/2022 and The parties expressly reserve all other rights of any kind. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 5/6/2022 GRANTING Defendants' 72 Motion to Dismiss. If Plaintiffs elect to amend their complaint, they shall file a Third Amended Complaint within twenty days (20) of this order. Defendants' responsive pleadings are due twenty days (20) thereafter. (Zignago, K.)
February 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 2/2/2022 ORDERING that Plaintiffs' opposition to 72 the motion to dismiss due by 2/28/2022, and Defendants' reply due by 3/21/2022. (Reader, L)
January 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 01/21/22 GRANTING 70 Application for Pro Hac Vice. Added attorney Paul R. Wood, PHV for Edward Anderson, Raymond Keith Corum, Janet Goral, Colleen Worthington and Jesse Worthington. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Benson, A.)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/8/2019 GRANTING 48 Motion to Dismiss in its entirety. Plaintiffs' 47 Second Amended Complaint is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. CASE CLOSED. (York, M)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 8/20/19. Plaintiffs' opposition shall be filed within twenty-one (21) days of the filing of the Motion to Dismiss, i.e., 9/9/2019. Defendants' reply in support of the Motion to Dismiss shall be filed within fourteen (14) days of the filing of Plaintiffs' opposition. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 7/8/19 GRANTING 29 Motion to Dismiss and dismissing the amended complaint with leave to amend. Plaintiffs' 42 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is DENIED as MOOT. (Kastilahn, A)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/26/18 GRANTING 28 Defendants' Request and ORDERING that Exhibits 14 through 17, 20 through 27, and 39 to the Declaration of Alexander Mircheff, submitted in support of Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint, shall remain UNDER SEAL. (Kastilahn, A)
November 13, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/13/18 GRANTING 25 Ex Parte Application for an Order Extending Page Limits. Defendants and Plaintiffs are GRANTED permission to file memoranda of law related to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint that exceed the page limits prescribed by the Court's 3 Order Re Filing Requirements as follows: Defendants' memorandum of law in support of their Motion not to exceed 20 pages; Plaintiffs' memorandum of law in opposition to Defendants' Motion not to exceed 20; and Defendants' reply memorandum of law in support of their Motion not to exceed 10 pages. (Coll, A)
July 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 07/25/18 GRANTING 14 Motion for Appointment as Lead Plaintiff and Approval of Selection of Counsel. The Master File shall be case no. 2:18-cv-0714 JAM AC In re: Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. Securities Litigation. Anderson Group is APPOINTED as Lead Plaintiff and Franklin D. Azar & Associates and Garner & Associates are APPROVED as Lead Counsel for the class. (Benson, A.)
May 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 05/30/18 GRANTING 13 Motion to Seal. (Benson, A.)
April 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING SERVICE AND PROCEDURES UNDER PRIVATE SECURITIES LITIGATION REFORM ACT signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 4/27/2018. (Fabillaran, J)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Anderson et al v. Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Anderson
Represented By: Franklin D. Azar, PHV
Represented By: John Randolph Garner
Represented By: Brian Hanlin, PHV
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Keith Corum
Represented By: Franklin D. Azar, PHV
Represented By: John Randolph Garner
Represented By: Brian Hanlin, PHV
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesse Worthington
Represented By: Franklin D. Azar, PHV
Represented By: John Randolph Garner
Represented By: Brian Hanlin, PHV
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Colleen Worthington
Represented By: Franklin D. Azar, PHV
Represented By: John Randolph Garner
Represented By: Brian Hanlin, PHV
Represented By: Ivy T. Ngo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward D. Jones & Co., L.P.
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Jones Financial Companies, LLLP
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EDJ Holding Company, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James D. Weddle
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penelope Pennington
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel J. Timm
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth R. Cella, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brett A. Campbell
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin D. Bastien
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norman L. Eaker
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent J. Ferrari
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy J. Kirley
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James A. Tricarico, Jr.
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olive Street Investment Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Passport Research, LTD.
Represented By: Alexander Kosta Mircheff
Represented By: Meryl Lyn Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?