Humes v. Sacramento County Superior Court
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Defendant: Sacramento County Superior Court
Case Number: 2:2018cv00769
Filed: April 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/18/2018 DISREGARDING documents filed since the closing date. No orders will issue in response to future filings. (Henshaw, R)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from Prison Account of Jon Humes signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/19/18. The Sheriff of Sacramento County shall collect payments from plaintiff's account and forward to the clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. Clerk to serve this order and a copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Sacramento County. Clerk to also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Plummer, M)
June 1, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 6/1/2018 DENYING 9 Motion for Court's Assistance, as framed but construed as a further request for extended time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the filing date of this order to submit a completed application to proceed IFP in this case. (Henshaw, R)
May 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 5/8/2018 DENYING 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and GRANTING 5 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff granted 30 days from the date of this order in which to file an IFP application. (Henshaw, R)
April 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 4/11/2018 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp, or the required fees in the amount of $400.00. The Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application.(Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Humes v. Sacramento County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Humes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sacramento County Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?