Brown v. Reif et al

Plaintiff: Ronnie Cherokee Brown
Defendant: C. Reif, S. Overby, J. Gomez, J. Overstreet and Special Appearance
Case Number: 2:2018cv01088
Filed: May 2, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/24/2019 GRANTING 70 Motion to Strike; ORDERING Clerk to strike 64 Opposition to Defendants' Answer and 77 Motion for Summary Judgment, as they were filed in violation of 44 Order; GRANTING 75 Motion for Protective Order; and DENYING 82 Motion for Extension of Time. (Henshaw, R)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 4/23/2019 DENYING plaintiff's 79 motion for the appointment of counsel. (Yin, K)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/28/2019 ADOPTING in FULL 31 and 44 Findings and Recommendations with clarifications included in Order; Defendant J. Overstreet is DISMISSED without leave to amend; DENYING 46 response cons trued as a request for reconsideration; DENYING 26 Motion for TRO, 38 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 38 Motion for TRO, 12 Motion for Preliminary Injunction and 12 Motion for TRO; The clerk is DIRECTED to serve this order and a copy of 51 objections on Senior Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson; Within 14 days from the date of this order, Senior Supervising Deputy Attorney General Monica Anderson shall address the law library access issue raised in plaintiff's objections; and; This case is referred back to the assigned magistrate judge for all further pretrial proceedings. (Washington, S)
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO POST-SCREENING ADR PROJECT AND STAYING CASE FOR 120 DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 2/20/2019. The parties shall file the attached notice re settlement conference within 30 days of this order. The assign ed DAG shall contact Courtroom Deputy within 30 days to schedule a settlement conference. Each party shall submit a confidential settlement conference statement at least 7 days prior to the conference. If settlement is reached, the parties shall file a Notice of Settlement. (cc: assigned Deputy Attorney General) (Yin, K)
November 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/09/18 DENYING 34 , 35 , 36 , 40 , 42 plaintiff's motions for the court to contact the warden; DENYING 37 plaintiff's motion to amend his moti on for a preliminary injunction; DENYING 41 plaintiff's motion for the appointment of counsel. In light of plaintiffs history of filing repetitious motions, plaintiff shall hereinafter be limited to filing the following documents: a. One disp ositive motion, limited to one memorandum of points and authorities in support of the motion and one reply to any opposition; b. One set of objections to these and any future findings and recommendations. The failure to comply with this order shall result in improperly filed documents being stricken from the record and may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. recommending that plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order 38 be deni ed. With the exception of objections to the findings and recommendations and any non-frivolous motions for emergency relief, the court will not entertain or respond to any additional motions filed by plaintiff until the court has received the comple ted service forms for defendants C. Reif, S. Overby, and J. Gomez. Also, RECOMMENDING that plaintiff's motion for a preliminary injunction and temporary restraining order 38 be denied. Motion 38 referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. Objections due within 14 days.(Plummer, M)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/14/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign this case to a district judge. Service is appropriate for J. Gomez, S. Overby, C. Reif. The Clerk shall send pl aintiff forms for service to be completed and returned within 30 days, along with the Notice of Submission. Plaintiff's 28 motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that defendant J. Ove rstreet be dismissed without leave to amend for the reasons set forth in the 6/15/2018 screening order 13 ; and plaintiff's 12 , 26 motions for a preliminary injunction and/or temporary restraining order be denied. Assigned and referred to Judge Kimberly J. Mueller; Objections to F&R due within 14 days. (Yin, K)
August 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/6/2018 DENYING without prejudice 11 and 19 Motions to Appoint Counsel. (Henshaw, R)
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 6/15/2018 ORDERING plaintiff's 10 motion for a temporary restraining order is DENIED for failing to comply with Local Rule 231. Within 14 days, Supervising Deputy Attorney General Chri stopher Becker shall file a special appearance and a response to plaintiff's 12 motion for injunctive relief. The Clerk shall serve this order, a copy of plaintiff's 1 complaint, and a copy of 12 the motion for injunctive relief. (cc: Christopher Becker)(Yin, K)
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/7/2018 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff an ifp application.(Yin, K)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brown v. Reif et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Cherokee Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Reif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Overby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Gomez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Overstreet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Special Appearance
Represented By: Sean W. Lodholz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?