Bonilla v. Beatty
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Defendant: Cara L. Beatty
Case Number: 2:2018cv01355
Filed: May 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K. Delaney
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 9/17/2018 RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
August 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 8/27/2018 VACATING the 7/11/2018 5 findings and recommendations and DENYING plaintiff's 8 application to proceed ifp. Plaintiff is GRANTED 14 days to pay the $400.00 filing fee for this action. Failure to pay the filing fee within 14 days will result in dismissal. (Yin, K)
July 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 7/11/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to assign a district court judge to this case and RECOMMENDING this action be dismissed without prejudice. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Henshaw, R)
May 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 5/29/2018 ORDERING Plaintiff to submit, within 30 days from the date of this order, a request to proceed IFP or the required fees of $400. (Henshaw, R)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonilla v. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara L. Beatty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?