Johnson v. Martel
Petitioner: Peter Jacob Johnson
Respondent: Michael Martel
Case Number: 2:2018cv01604
Filed: June 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Presiding Judge: Troy L. Nunley
Nature of Suit: General
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 9/17/2018 DENYING Petitioner's request for the court to complete his withdrawal slip. If Petitioner seeks copies, he should complete the withdrawal slip using the information provided in this order. (Henshaw, R)
August 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 08/08/18 ORDERING petitioner's request for an extension of time 4 is GRANTED to the extent that he shall have 30 days from service of this order to file objections to the 7/09/18 findings and recommendations. To the extent that petitioner seeks an extension of time for any other purpose, the request is DENIED. Petitioner's request for copies 4 is GRANTED IN PART. The clerk of the court is directed to provide petitioner with a courtesy copy of the first 25 pages of the petition only. (Plummer, M)
July 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER, FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 7/9/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to randomly assign a United States District Judge to this action and RECOMMENDING petitioner's 1 application for writ of habeas corpus be dismissed for lack of habeas jurisdiction. Assigned and referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley; Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Peter Jacob Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Michael Martel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?