Orion Wine Imports, LLC et al v. Appelsmith
Plaintiff: Orion Wine Imports, LLC and Peter E. Creighton
Defendant: Jacob Appelsmith
Case Number: 2:2018cv01721
Filed: June 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Presiding Judge: Kimberly J. Mueller
Nature of Suit: Other Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER signed by Chief District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 2/19/2020 GRANTING 56 Motion to Dismiss without leave to amend. At hearing, Plaintiffs clarified they did not intend to seek further amendment of their complaint if the court dismissed it, as it now has. CASE CLOSED. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 8/15/2019 GRANTING 33 Motion to Dismiss plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs leave to amend only as to the issues identified. Plaintiffs are ORDERED to file any amended complaint within 21 days of the date this order is filed. (Reader, L)
December 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 39 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 12/17/2018 ORDERING the 33 Motion to Dismiss hearing is CONTINUED to 2/8/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Washington, S)
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 10/1/2018 GRANTING 17 Motion to Amend the Complaint and DIRECTING Plaintiffs to file their second amended complaint 21 days of the date this order is filed. Defendant's 15 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED AS MOOT with leave to refile upon the filing of a second amended complaint. The court VACATES the hearing on those motions and RESETS the status (pretrial scheduling) conference for 12/13/2018, at 02:30 PM, in Courtroom 3 (KJM), before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. The parties shall file a joint status report 7 days prior to the new date of the status conference. (York, M)
September 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 STIPULATION and ORDER signed by District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 9/13/2018 ORDERING that the Amici shall be permitted to participate as amici in connection with pleadings challenges in this action, including by filing a brief in advance of the next hearing scheduled in this action.(Washington, S)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Orion Wine Imports, LLC et al v. Appelsmith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Orion Wine Imports, LLC
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein, PHV
Represented By: James Ernest Simon
Represented By: Kristina M. Swanson, PHV
Represented By: James A. Tanford, PHV
Represented By: Ravn Reece Whitington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter E. Creighton
Represented By: Robert D. Epstein, PHV
Represented By: James Ernest Simon
Represented By: Kristina M. Swanson, PHV
Represented By: James A. Tanford, PHV
Represented By: Ravn Reece Whitington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jacob Appelsmith
Represented By: Lykisha D. Beasley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?