(PC) Melger v. Roseville Police Department et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Melger
Defendant: City of Roseville, Roseville Police Department and Chad Baumann
Case Number: 2:2018cv01957
Filed: July 16, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Marin
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 10 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal served on Thomas Joseph Melger. (Plummer, M)
July 31, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Notice of Dismissal #9 and FRCP 41(a). CASE CLOSED (Plummer, M)
July 27, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST to WITHDRAW #2 #8 IFP; NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Thomas Joseph Melger. (Benson, A.)
July 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Thomas Joseph Melger. (Reader, L)
July 26, 2018 Filing 7 FIRST AMENDED PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas Joseph Melger.(Kastilahn, A)
July 26, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Thomas Joseph Melger. (Kastilahn, A)
July 25, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Thomas Joseph Melger (Reader, L)
July 24, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: (ECF No. 4) Notice re TRUST STATEMENT NEEDED served on Thomas Joseph Melger. (Yin, K)
July 24, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE (text only): The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Thomas Joseph Melger, CDCR# BF-7914 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Yin, K)
July 17, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, served on Thomas Joseph Melger. (Kaminski, H)
July 17, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 8/20/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Kaminski, H)
July 16, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Thomas Joseph Melger. (Kaminski, H)
July 16, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Thomas Joseph Melger.(Kaminski, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Melger v. Roseville Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Roseville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roseville Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Baumann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Joseph Melger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?