(PC) Mays v. County of Sacramento
Plaintiff: Cody Garland, Lorenzo Mays, Jennifer Bothun, Leertese Beirge, Armani Lee and Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr.
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Case Number: 2:2018cv02081
Filed: July 31, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: Sacramento
Presiding Judge: Kendall J Newman
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 4, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 27, 2018 Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tifanei Ressl-Moyer on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Ressl-Moyer, Tifanei added. (Ressl-Moyer, Tifanei)
September 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF NON-RELATED CASES signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 9/27/2018 ACCORDINGLY Case 2:18-CV-2081 TLN KJN, shall not be reassigned to the undersigned judge. #15 (Reader, L)(Reader, L)
September 25, 2018 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sophie Jedeikin Hart on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Hart, Sophie Jedeikin added. (Hart, Sophie)
September 21, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Anne Hadreas on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Hadreas, Anne added. (Hadreas, Anne)
September 21, 2018 Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Defendant County of Sacramento to #15 Notice of Related Case. Attorney Ridley, Shawn M. added. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Ridley, #2 Request for Judicial Notice)(Ridley, Shawn)
September 19, 2018 Filing 18 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mark Anthony Zambarda on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Zambarda, Mark Anthony added. (Zambarda, Mark)
September 19, 2018 Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Addison Mills Litton on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Litton, Addison Mills added. (Litton, Addison)
September 17, 2018 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy M. Krueger for District Judge Troy L. Nunley on 9/17/2018: The Court is in receipt of Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases (ECF No. #15 ). Pursuant to Local Rule 123(b), Counsel shall promptly file the Notice of Related Cases in cases 2:18-cv-00044-JAM-KJN and 2:13-cv-2499-JAM-AC, and serve a copy on all parties. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Krueger, M)
September 17, 2018 Filing 15 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-00044, 2:13-vs-02499 by Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. (Mendelson, Margot)
September 14, 2018 Filing 14 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Kathlyn Anne Querubin on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Querubin, Kathlyn Anne added. (Querubin, Kathlyn)
September 14, 2018 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Santamaria, Jessica Valenzuela added. (Santamaria, Jessica)
September 14, 2018 Filing 12 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to #11 Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-2081 TLN KJN (PC). (Henshaw, R)
September 13, 2018 Filing 11 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. (Fischer, Aaron)
September 13, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Margot Knight Mendelson on behalf of Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Cody Garland, Armani Lee, Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr. Attorney Mendelson, Margot Knight added. (Mendelson, Margot)
September 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 9/10/2018 GRANTING Defendant until 10/2/2018 to file its response to the complaint. (Henshaw, R)
September 4, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION to EXTEND TIME for defendant County of Sacramento to file response to complaint by County of Sacramento. Attorney Master, Todd Holton added. (Master, Todd)
August 24, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Fischer, Aaron)
August 10, 2018 Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy J. Fabillaran for Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2018: On the Court's own motion, the filing deadline and Status Conference set forth in the previous #3 Order are hereby VACATED. The Status Conference is RESET for 12/06/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman and the parties are ORDERED to file status reports, as detailed in the previous #3 Order, on or before close of business on 11/27/2018. (TEXT ONLY ENTRY) (Fabillaran, J)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT OR REQUEST FOR REASSIGNMENT signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/10/2018. Consent or Decline due by 9/13/2018. (Henshaw, R)
August 10, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *County of Sacramento* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Aaron Joseph Fischer* *Disability Rights California* *1330 Broadway, Suite 500* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Henshaw, R)
August 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 8/9/2018 DIRECTING Clerk of Court to issue and send plaintiff one summons for defendant County of Sacramento and copies of the form "Consent to Proceed Before United States Magistrate Judge" with this order; ORDERING Plaintiffs to complete service of process on defendant within 60 days from the date of this order; ORDERING parties to file status reports, as detailed in this Order, on or before close of business on 11/29/2018; and SETTING Status Conference for 12/13/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Clerk of Court to change the short title of this case to Mays v. County of Sacramento. (Henshaw, R)
July 31, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/4/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
July 31, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lorenzo Mays, Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr, Leertese Beirge, Jennifer Bothun, Armani Lee, Cody Garland. Attorney Fischer, Aaron Joseph added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7787776) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fischer, Aaron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Mays v. County of Sacramento
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Garland
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorenzo Mays
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Bothun
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leertese Beirge
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Armani Lee
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky Lee Richardson, Jr.
Represented By: Aaron Joseph Fischer
Represented By: Kathlyn Anne Querubin
Represented By: Addison Mills Litton
Represented By: Sophie Jedeikin Hart
Represented By: Tifanei Ressl-Moyer
Represented By: Jessica Valenzuela Santamaria
Represented By: Margot Knight Mendelson
Represented By: Anne Hadreas
Represented By: Mark Anthony Zambarda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Sacramento
Represented By: Shawn M. Ridley
Represented By: Todd Holton Master
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?