(PC) Stowers v. Harbako
Plaintiff: Stephen Stowers
Defendant: Harbako
Case Number: 2:2018cv02177
Filed: August 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Sacramento Office
County: San Luis Obispo
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2018 Filing 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Stephen Stowers. (Washington, S)
August 14, 2018 Filing 5 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Stephen Stowers. (Kastilahn, A)
August 13, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 4 Notice re TRUST STATEMENT NEEDED,, served on Stephen Stowers. (Plummer, M)
August 13, 2018 Filing 4 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Stephen Stowers, CDC P-69814 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsSacramento@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (TEXT ONLY) (Plummer, M)
August 10, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Stephen Stowers. (Washington, S)
August 10, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 9/13/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Washington, S)
August 9, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Stephen Stowers. (Washington, S) Modified on 8/13/2018 (Plummer, M).
August 9, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Harbako by Stephen Stowers.(Washington, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Stowers v. Harbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Stowers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?