Ski Run Marina, LLC v. Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC

Plaintiff: Ski Run Marina, LLC
Defendant: Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02271
Filed: August 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
0 Judge: Deborah Barnes
1 Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2018 Filing 18 REPLY by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC to OPPOSITION to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Goulding, Lindsay) Modified on 10/18/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 12, 2018 Filing 17 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. (Goulding, Lindsay)
October 2, 2018 Filing 16 OPPOSITION by Ski Run Marina, LLC to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Objection to Request for Judicial Notice)(Van Dyke, Glen)
October 2, 2018 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Plaintiff's Proposed Attorney Substitution (ECF No. #14 ) is GRANTED. Accordingly, Attorney Glen A. Van Dyke is SUBSTITUTED as counsel of record for Plaintiff Ski Run Marina, LLC in place of Attorney Clifford R. Horner. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
September 27, 2018 Filing 14 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ski Run Marina, LLC. (Van Dyke, Glen)
September 26, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Because it is not clear whether proposed substituted counsel Allza Bessie Alyeshmerni is admitted to practice in this court and because counsel has not submitted a pro hac vice application, the substitution of attorney, ECF No. #12 , is DENIED without prejudice. (Text Only Entry)(Schultz, C)
September 21, 2018 Filing 12 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ski Run Marina, LLC. (Horner, Clifford)
August 28, 2018 Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER issued by Courtroom Deputy C. Schultz for District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: On the court's own motion, the Status (Pretrial Scheduling) Conference set for 1/17/2019 is VACATED and ADVANCED to 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller, with the filing of a joint status report due seven days prior. (Text Only Entry) (Schultz, C)
August 27, 2018 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC re #5 Civil New Case Documents for KJM. (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 27, 2018 Filing 9 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 3, # 2 Exhibit 4, # 3 Exhibit 5, # 4 Exhibit 6, # 5 Exhibit 7, # 6 Exhibit 8, # 7 Exhibit 9, # 8 Exhibit 10, # 9 Exhibit 11)((Goulding, Lindsay) Modified on 8/29/2018 (Kastilahn, A).
August 27, 2018 Filing 8 DECLARATION of Lindsay A. Goulding in support of #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Goulding, Lindsay)
August 27, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC in SUPPORT of #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 27, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 21, 2018 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/17/2019 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 3 (KJM) before District Judge Kimberly J. Mueller. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Reader, L)
August 20, 2018 PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 400, receipt number 0972-7821824. (Jensen, Martin)
August 20, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 20, 2018 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC. (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 20, 2018 Filing 2 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC in re #1 Notice of Removal. (Goulding, Lindsay)
August 20, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from El Dorado County Superior Court case number SC20180127 by Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Lindsay A. Goulding)(Goulding, Lindsay)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ski Run Marina, LLC v. Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ski Run Marina, LLC
Represented By: Clifford Rex Horner
Represented By: Clifford Horner
Represented By: Glen A. Van Dyke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aramark Sports and Entertainment Services, LLC
Represented By: Lindsay A. Goulding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?