Edwards v. City of Vallejo et al
Plaintiff: Carl Edwards
Defendant: Bretton Wagoner, City of Vallejo, Mark Thompson, Andrew Bidou, Steve Darden and Spencer Muniz-Bottomley
Case Number: 2:2018cv02434
Filed: September 5, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2018 Filing 14 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, Steve Darden, Spencer Muniz-Bottomley, Mark Thompson, Bretton Wagoner. (Knight, Katelyn)
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, Steve Darden, Spencer Muniz-Bottomley, Mark Thompson, Bretton Wagoner. Attorney Knight, Katelyn M. added.(Knight, Katelyn)
September 20, 2018 Filing 12 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Carl Edwards. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 11 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Steve Darden served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Bretton Wagoner served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mark Thompson served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Spencer Muniz-Bottomley served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Andrew Bidou served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 12, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: City of Vallejo served on 9/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. (Allen, Teresa)
September 5, 2018 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Maya Melissa Sorensen on behalf of Carl Edwards. Attorney Sorensen, Maya Melissa added. (Sorensen, Maya)
September 5, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Julia Sherwin on behalf of Carl Edwards. Attorney Sherwin, Julia added. (Sherwin, Julia)
September 5, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
September 5, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Andrew Bidou, City of Vallejo, Steve Darden, Spencer Muniz-Bottomley, Mark Thompson, Bretton Wagoner* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Michael Joseph Haddad* *Haddad & Sherwin, LLP* *505 17th Street* *Oakland, CA 94612*. (Kastilahn, A)
September 5, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Carl Edwards. Attorney Allen, Teresa Denise added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7849443) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Allen, Teresa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. City of Vallejo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bretton Wagoner
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Vallejo
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Thompson
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Bidou
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Steve Darden
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spencer Muniz-Bottomley
Represented By: Katelyn M. Knight
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carl Edwards
Represented By: Julia Sherwin
Represented By: Teresa Denise Allen
Represented By: Maya Melissa Sorensen
Represented By: Michael Joseph Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?