Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Yardstash Solutions, LLC.

Plaintiff: Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc.
Defendant: Yardstash Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 2:2018cv02465
Filed: September 10, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
1 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
September 10, 2018 18 PATENT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Patent #1:* D689,579 * * 9/10/2013 * * Yardstash Solutions, LLC * Patent #2:* D661,513 * * 6/12/2012 * * Yardstash Solutions, LLC * (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 Patent Report, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2018 17 CLERK'S NOTICE to Vianni Lopez-Rodriguez, Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera, and Yasaman Sharif: Please complete the Petition by Attorney for Admission to practice in the Eastern District of California. (Sant Agata, S)
September 10, 2018 16 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Puerto Rico; Case Number 3:18-cv-01112.
August 31, 2018 15 Featured Case MEMORANDUM AND ORDER re #9 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction: GRANTED. Accordingly, this action is TRANSFERRED to the Eastern District of California. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 08/31/2018. (brc) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
June 8, 2018 14 Featured Case ORDER re #13 Motion to Amend/Correct. Amendment is NOTED. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 06/08/2018. (brc) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
June 7, 2018 13 MOTION to Amend/Correct Docket No. 12 to include Local Counsel Re: #12 Reply to Response to Motion, filed by Yardstash Solutions, LLC. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Yardstash Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 6/21/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Related document(s) #12 ) (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
June 6, 2018 12 REPLY to Response to Motion filed by Yardstash Solutions, LLC. Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction or alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, as to Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yardstash Solutions, LLC. filed by Yardstash Solutions, LLC.. (Sharif, Yasaman) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 30, 2018 11 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss filed by Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. Re: #9 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction or alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, as to Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Yardstash Solutions, LLC. filed by Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Lopez-Rodriguez, Vianni) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 15, 2018 10 Featured Case ORDER re #8 Motion to Appear PHV: GRANTED. The Clerk will deposit the admission fee in the Court's non-appropriated funds account. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 05/15/2018. (brc) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 15, 2018 9 MOTION to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction or alternatively, to Transfer Venue to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California, as to Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Yardstash Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Mr. Van Barker's Declaration under Penalty of Perjury, #2 Affidavit Mr. Faust's Declaration under Penalty of Perjury, #3 Exhibit A-Complaint filed in U.S.D.C.-S.D.CA., #4 Exhibit B-Plaintiff's Certificate of Incorporation, #5 Exhibit C-Friedland Enterprises Printout, #6 Exhibit D-CA Sec. of State Statement of Information, #7 Exhibit E-Declaration of Adam Acrich, #8 Exhibit F-Email from Bellver dated 1/30/2018, #9 Exhibit G-U.S.D.C.-S.D.C.A. Order Transferring case to E.D.CA., #10 Exhibit H- Defendant's Notice of Pending Motions filed by Marketfleet, #11 Exhibit I-U.S.D.C.-E.D.CA.Minute Order)(Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 15, 2018 8 Motion to allow Yasaman Sharif to appear pro hac vice (Pro Hac fee $300 receipt number 0104-5872750) filed by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Yardstash Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/29/2018. NOTE: Pursuant to FRCP 6(a) an additional three days does not apply to service done electronically. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 15, 2018 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera on behalf of Yardstash Solutions, LLC. (Suria-Rivera, Kenneth) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
May 3, 2018 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. served to George Barker, Registered Agent of Yardstash Solutions, LLC (Lopez-Rodriguez, Vianni) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 5 Featured Case ORDER re #1 Complaint. The Clerk will remove the restriction on this complaint. Signed by Judge Francisco A. Besosa on 02/27/2018. (brc) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 4 Summons Issued as to YARDSTASH SOLUTIONS LLC (Attachments: #1 Summons) (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
February 27, 2018 3 NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT Case has been assigned to Judge Francisco A. Besosa (arg) [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
February 26, 2018 2 Report on Filing of Patent/Trademark Action (Initial Notification), by Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. (Lopez-Rodriguez, Vianni) Modified on 2/27/2018 to edit docket text (ab). [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]
February 26, 2018 1 COMPLAINT / Verified Complaint against Yardstash Solutions, LLC. ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 0104-5764076.), filed by Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc.. Service due by 5/29/2018, (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Category Sheet, #3 Summons Summons, #4 Summons Waiver of Summons, #5 Exhibit Exhibits A - G)(Lopez-Rodriguez, Vianni) Modified on 2/27/2018 to replace capital letters (ab). Modified on 2/27/2018 to remove restriction as per dkt.5 Order (ab). [Transferred from prd on 9/10/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc. v. Yardstash Solutions, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marketfleet Puerto Rico, Inc.
Represented By: Vianni Lopez-Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yardstash Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Kenneth C. Suria-Rivera
Represented By: Yasaman Sharif
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?