(PC) Bonilla v. Solano County

Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Defendant: Solano County
Case Number: 2:2018cv02554
Filed: September 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2018 Filing 6 LETTER from Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 4, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: 5 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
October 4, 2018 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge John A. Mendez and Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-02554-JAM-KJN (PC). (Huang, H)
October 3, 2018 Filing 4 DECLINE to PROCEED BEFORE US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
October 3, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order and ifp application served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Yin, K)
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 10/3/2018 ORDERING plaintiff to submit, within 30 days, an affidavit to proceed ifp or the required fees in the amount of $400.00; and the Clerk shall send plaintiff a new ifp application. (Yin, K)
September 20, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Steven Wayne Bonilla. (Huang, H)
September 20, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/25/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
September 19, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Solano County by Steven Wayne Bonilla.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bonilla v. Solano County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solano County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Wayne Bonilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?