(PS) Ryse v. Friend et al
Plaintiff: Dorothea Ryse
Defendant: Rodrieguez, Becker and Friend
Case Number: 2:2018cv02600
Filed: September 21, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Kimberly J Mueller
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order served on Dorothea Ryse. (Huang, H)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 10/29/2018 DISMISSING #1 Complaint with leave to amend. An amended complaint shall be filed within 28 days from the date of this order. Failure to comply with this order in a timely manner may result in a recommendation that this action be dismissed. (Huang, H)
September 24, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Becknal, R)
September 21, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dorothea Ryse. (Becknal, R)
September 21, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dorothea Ryse.(Becknal, R)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) Ryse v. Friend et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothea Ryse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodrieguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Becker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Friend
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?