Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.71.165.41
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.71.165.41
Case Number: 2:2018cv02642
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Referring Judge: Morrison C England
2 Judge: Kendall J Newman
3 Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/18 GRANTING #6 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena within the terms of the order; plaintiff shall file a status report within 45 days; Plaintiff is cautioned that, until permission is given by the court, it is not to reveal the identity of the defendant in or out of court. (Benson, A.)
October 26, 2018 Filing 6 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points And Authorities, #2 Exhibits A-D Declarations, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln) Modified on 10/29/2018 (Washington, S).
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Chief Judge Lawrence J. O'Neill: Due to the pending retirement of Magistrate Judge *Gregory G. Hollows* from the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned to *Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney* for all further proceedings. (Donati, J)
October 9, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Kastilahn, A)
October 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., on 10/4/18 REASSIGNING the captioned actions listed in this order to U.S. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr., and U.S. Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows. All future filings shall denote the reassignment to U.S. District Judge England and U.S. Magistrate Judge Hollows by replacing the trailing initials on each case number with MCE-GGH. The 3/18/19 Initial Scheduling Conference is hereby VACATED. (Kastilahn, A)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019, at 01:30 PM, in Courtroom 5 (WBS), before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (York, M)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.71.165.41 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7890737) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 Copyright Report) (Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.71.165.41
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 73.71.165.41
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?