Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.208.93.240
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.208.93.240
Case Number: 2:2018cv02643
Filed: September 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
2 Judge: Morrison C England
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney on 11/14/2018 GRANTING on the terms of this order #4 Ex Parte Application for Leave to Serve a 3rd Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Not later than 45 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall file a status report. Plaintiff is CAUTIONED that, until permission is given by the court, it is not to reveal the identity of the defendant in or out of court. Nothing in this order precludes plaintiff and defendant from reaching a settlement without court participation before any informal conference is held or formal service of process is effectuated. (York, M)
November 9, 2018 Filing 4 EX PARTE APPLICATION by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC for Leave To Serve A Third Party Subpoena Prior To A Rule 26(f) Conference. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A-D, #3 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr on 10/26/18 REASSIGNING this CASE to Magistrate Judge Carolyn K. Delaney for all further proceedings. New Case Number is: 2:18-cv-02643-MCE-CKD. All future filings shall denote the reassignment to U.S. District Judge England and U.S. Magistrate Judge Delaney by replacing the trailing initials on each case number with: MCE-CKD.(Mena-Sanchez, L)
September 27, 2018 Filing 2 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED : (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (York, M)
September 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.208.93.240 by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Attorney Bandlow, Lincoln Dee added. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7890741) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Interested Entities or Persons, #4 Notice Of Filing Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, #5 Copyright Report) (Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.208.93.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln Dee Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 98.208.93.240
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?