United States of America v. State of California et al Featured Case

Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr. and State of California
Amicus Curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Case Number: 2:2018cv02660
Filed: September 30, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
0 Judge: Deborah Barnes
1 Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed#Document Text
October 26, 2018 17 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2018 ORDERING the case STAYED until the later of the following: (a) the D.C. Circuit issues its opinion in the petitions for review currently pending in Mozilla Corp. v. FCC, and the period for seeking further review from the D.C. Circuit and the U.S. Supreme Court has expired; or (b) a final decision has been issued by the D.C. Circuit or the U.S. Supreme Court in response to any petition for rehearing or certiorari, either denying such petition or issuing a final decision. Plaintiffs' 2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction have been withdrawn without prejudice to their refiling at a future date. The hearing on the motions, previously set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 a.m. is taken off calendar. (Washington, S)
October 26, 2018 16 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/26/2018 ORDERING Defendants' deadline to file their brief in opposition to the motions for a preliminary injunction is EXTENDED to 10/30/2018. (Washington, S)
October 26, 2018 15 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Temporary Stay of Litigation and Agreement Not to Enforce Senate Bill 822 by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 26, 2018 14 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Preliminary Injunction Motions by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 19, 2018 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Joseph Evan Borson on behalf of United States of America. Attorney Borson, Joseph Evan added. (Borson, Joseph)
October 19, 2018 12 MOTION for LEAVE to FILE AMICUS BRIEF by Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America. Attorney Weir, Bryan Kipp added. Motion Hearing set for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Amicus Brief, # 2 Proposed Order) (Weir, Bryan)
October 10, 2018 11 Featured Case ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/10/2018 ORDERING the #3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction is SET for 11/28/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. Any motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of motion shall be filed on or by 10/19/2018; Defendant's one brief in opposition to both motions shall be filed on or by 10/26/2018; Any motions for leave to file amicus briefs in support of defendants shall be filed on or by 11/2/2018; Plaintiffs may each file their own reply in support of their respective motions on or by 11/9/2018. Defendants' time to answer or respond to complaints shall be EXTENDED to 30 days after Court enters an order resolving the respective motions for preliminary injunction filed in those matters. (Washington, S)
October 10, 2018 10 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Setting Hearing Date and Briefing Schedule for Preliminary Injunction Motions by Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Li, Peiyin)
October 5, 2018 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. Attorney Kurtz, Sarah Elizabeth added. (Kurtz, Sarah)
October 5, 2018 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peiyin Patty Li on behalf of Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California. Attorney Li, Peiyin Patty added. (Li, Peiyin)
October 5, 2018 7 Featured Case RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/03/18 REASSIGNING Action denominated 2:18-CV-02684 WBS-DB to District Judge John A. Mendez for all further proceedings, and any dates currently set in the reassigned case only are hereby VACATED. The caption on documents filed in the reassigned case shall be shown as 2:18-CV-02684 JAM-DB. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court make appropriate adjustment in the assignment of civil cases to compensate for this reassignment. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
October 5, 2018 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: All Defendants. (Snell, Kevin)
October 1, 2018 5 MINUTE ORDER issued by Relief Courtroom Deputy G. Michel for District Judge John A. Mendez on 10/1/2018: The Court hereby sets a hearing date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction (ECF No. #2 ) for Wednesday, November 14, 2018 at 10:00 AM. Defendants' opposition brief is due by Friday, October 19, 2018. Plaintiff's reply brief is due by Friday, November 2, 2018. (Michel, G.)
October 1, 2018 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Donati, J)
October 1, 2018 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Xavier Becerra, Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr, State of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Kevin Matthew Snell* *US Department of Justice* *1100 L Street, NW* *Washington, DC 20530*. (Donati, J)
September 30, 2018 2 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Notice Cal. S. Comm. on Judiciary, #3 Notice Cal. S. Comm. on Energy, Utils., & Commcns, #4 Notice Cal. Assembly Comm. on Commcns & Conveyance, #5 Notice Br. for the Govt. Pets., Mozilla v. FCC, #6 Proposed Order)(Snell, Kevin)
September 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Snell, Kevin Matthew added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Snell, Kevin)
September 30, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by United States of America. Attorney Snell, Kevin Matthew added. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Snell, Kevin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. State of California et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund Gerald Brown, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of California
Represented By: Sarah Elizabeth Kurtz
Represented By: Peiyin Patty Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Kevin Matthew Snell
Represented By: Joseph Evan Borson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Chamber of Commerce of the United States of America
Represented By: Bryan Kipp Weir
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?