(PC) Bivins v. Rodriguez et al
Plaintiff: John Bivins and John Penn Bivins
Defendant: Chris Sarabia and Marco Rodriguez
Case Number: 2:2018cv02671
Filed: October 1, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dennis M Cota
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF SUBMISSION OF DOCUMENTS: 1 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms and 3 copies of the complaint by John Penn Bivins. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order, 1 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 10/1/2018 served on John Penn Bivins. (Henshaw, R)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 11/2/2018 DIRECTING PLAINTIFF TO SUBMIT SERVICE DOCUMENTS and USM-285 Forms. Service is appropriate for Rodriguez and Sarabia. Clerk to send plaintiff: 1 Summons, 2 USM-285 Forms with instruction sheet, and 1 copy of the Complaint filed on 10/1/2018. Plaintiff to complete and submit the Notice of Submission of Documents with service documents within 30 days of the date of service of this order. (Henshaw, R)
October 25, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #9 Order Directing Prisoner Payment served on John Penn Bivins. Copies of #9 Order and ifp served on Sheriff of Santa Clara County. (Yin, K)
October 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DIRECTING MONTHLY PAYMENTS be made from the Trust Account of John Penn Bivins signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/24/2018. Plaintiff's #7 motion to proceed IFP is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall pay the $350.00 filing fee in accordance with this order. The Sheriff shall collect an initial partial filing fee and thereafter the balance in monthly payments and forward to the Clerk until the $350.00 filing fee is paid in full. The Clerk is directed to serve this order and copy of plaintiff's IFP on the Sheriff of Santa Clara County. The Clerk shall also serve Financial with a copy of this order. (cc: Financial)(Yin, K)
October 17, 2018 Filing 8 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Penn Bivins. (Huang, H)
October 15, 2018 Filing 7 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by John Penn Bivins. (Coll, A)
October 11, 2018 Filing 6 REQUEST for Pro Per Status by John Penn Bivins. (Coll, A)
October 11, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by John Penn Bivins. (Coll, A)
October 11, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order and IFP application served on John Penn Bivins. (Huang, H)
October 11, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Dennis M. Cota on 10/11/18 DIRECTING Plaintiff to submit IFP application or filing fee within 30 days from the date of this order. (Huang, H)
October 5, 2018 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider re-served on John Penn Bivins at SCJ-Main Jail North. (Yin, K)
October 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on John Bivins. (Coll, A)
October 2, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/5/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Coll, A)
October 1, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by John Bivins. (Coll, A)
October 1, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Bivins.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bivins v. Rodriguez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Bivins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Penn Bivins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chris Sarabia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marco Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?