Alexander Stross v. 3 Phaze Electric, Inc.
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Defendant: 3 Phaze Electric Inc.
Case Number: 2:2018cv02715
Filed: October 9, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: William B Shubb
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 24, 2018 Filing 17 ANSWER with Jury Demand by 3 Phaze Electric Inc.. (Attachments: #1 3 Phaze Electric, Inc.'s Fed. R. Civ. P. 8.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement)(Smith, Shane)
October 9, 2018 Filing 16 COPYRIGHT NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Copyright #1:* VAu 989-644 * * Woodland_Park_Models_00086 * * ALEXANDER BAYONNE STROSS * ; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/18/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 5 (WBS) before Senior Judge William B. Shubb. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Copyright Report, #3 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
October 9, 2018 Filing 15 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of California Central; Case Number 2:18-cv-06660.
October 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER RE JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson transferring case to Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division. Case electronically transferred on 10/4/2018. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
September 28, 2018 Filing 13 Joint STIPULATION to Transfer Case to Eastern District of California, Sacramento Division filed by defendant 3 Phaze Electric Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shane Garrett Smith added to party 3 Phaze Electric Inc.(pty:dft))(Smith, Shane) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
September 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 11 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh to Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:18-cv-06660 SVW(ASx). (rn) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross, upon Defendant 3 Phaze Electric Inc. served on 8/7/2018, answer due 9/28/2018. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon First Corporate Solutions Inc c/o Dena la Porta - Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
September 5, 2018 Filing 9 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (sbou) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 28, 2018 Filing 8 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 3 Phaze Electric Inc. answer now due 9/28/2018, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross.(Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant 3 Phaze Electric Inc.. (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 3, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C) (lh) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross, (Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]
August 2, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-22193846 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Alexander Stross. (Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Alexander Stross(pty:pla))(Doniger, Stephen) [Transferred from cacd on 10/9/2018.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander Stross v. 3 Phaze Electric, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 3 Phaze Electric Inc.
Represented By: Shane Garrett Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander Stross
Represented By: Frank Gregory Casella
Represented By: Stephen Michael Doniger
Represented By: Scott Alan Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?