(PC) Muhammad v. Kesterson et al
Plaintiff: Kwesi Muhammad
Defendant: Melba Starr and Kathryn Kesterson
Case Number: 2:2018cv02775
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kwesi Muhammad. (Huang, H)
November 14, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents and #4 Order served on Kwesi Muhammad to CTF Soledad. (Henshaw, R)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/13/2018 ORDERING Clerk of Court to designate plaintiff's current address at CTF Soledad on the docket and re-serve the returned documents to plaintiff at his current address. (Henshaw, R)
November 7, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2;18-CV-02775, 2:18-CV-02831 by Kathryn Kesterson, Melba Starr. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vong, Steven)
November 6, 2018 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, No Such Street, Unable to Forward: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Kwesi Muhammad. Notice of Change of Address due by 1/14/2019. (Huang, H)
October 18, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kwesi Muhammad. (Yin, K)
October 16, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/19/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Becknal, R)
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number CV-UCR-2018-11215 by All Defendants. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0972-7919174) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Vong, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Muhammad v. Kesterson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melba Starr
Represented By: Steven Edward Vong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn Kesterson
Represented By: Steven Edward Vong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwesi Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?