(PC) Fisher v. Director of OPS of CDCR
Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Defendant: Director of OPS of CDCR
Case Number: 2:2018cv02799
Filed: October 18, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Carolyn K Delaney
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST for Copies by Gary Francis Fisher. (Coll, A)
November 1, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Gary Francis Fisher. (Coll, A)
October 19, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gary Francis Fisher. (Huang, H)
October 19, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/23/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
October 18, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE in Support of #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint by Gary Francis Fisher. (Huang, H)
October 18, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Director of OPS of CDCR by Gary Francis Fisher.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fisher v. Director of OPS of CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director of OPS of CDCR
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?