(SS) Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Zena Mae Anderson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv02809
Filed: October 19, 2018
Court: California Eastern District Court
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2018 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Zena Mae Anderson. Commissioner of Social Security served on 11/28/2018. (Coll, A)
December 6, 2018 9 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Commissioner of Social Security. Attorney Naicker, Tina added. (Naicker, Tina)
November 29, 2018 8 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only). "The parties are notified that the Magistrate Judge has updated standing orders which include briefing page limits. The standing orders can be found on the Court's website at http://www.caed.uscourts.gov/caednew/assets/File/Judge%20Claire%20Standing% 20Orders.pdf. Briefs submitted in excess of the page limit, without leave of court, will be considered improperly filed." (Callen, V)
October 25, 2018 7 NOTICE re summons, complaint sent to U.S. Marshal by Zena Mae Anderson. (Johnson, John) Modified on 10/26/2018 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
October 24, 2018 6 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Zena Mae Anderson. (Johnson, John)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 1/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 SS Consent Form) (Becknal, R)
October 23, 2018 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *John Vincent Johnson* *Law Offices of John V. Johnson* *341 Flume Street, Suite C* *Chico, CA 95928*. (Becknal, R)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order 3 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 10/23/18 GRANTING the plaintiff's #2 request to Proceed in forma pauperis; DIRECTING the Clerk to serve scheduling order; and within 14 days, plaintiff shall submit service documents to the USM and file a statement to the court re the submission; USM shall serve process within 60 days. (Becknal, R)
October 19, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (York, M)
October 19, 2018 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Zena Mae Anderson. (Johnson, John)
October 19, 2018 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Zena Mae Anderson. Attorney Johnson, John Vincent added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Johnson, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Anderson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zena Mae Anderson
Represented By: John Vincent Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?