(PC) Fisher v. California
Plaintiff: Sonny Barger, II and Gary Francis Fisher
Defendant: California
Case Number: 2:2018cv02819
Filed: October 22, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Referring Judge: Troy L Nunley
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Findings and Recommendations served on Gary Francis Fisher. (Coll, A)
November 29, 2018 Filing 6 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/28/18 RECOMMENDING that this matter be Dismissed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(g). Referred to Judge Troy L. Nunley. Objections due within 14 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Coll, A)
November 2, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Gary Francis Fisher. (Plummer, M)
November 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 11/02/18 ORDERING the Clerk of Court randomly assign a District Judge to this matter. U.S. District Court Troy L. Nunley randomly assigned to this action. The new case number is 2:18-cv-2819 TLN DB (PC). Within twenty-one days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit the appropriate filing fee.(Plummer, M)
November 2, 2018 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE (TEXT ONLY) pursuant to Decline of Jurisdiction of US Magistrate Judge, this case has been assigned to District Judge Troy L. Nunley and Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes. The new case number is: 2:18-cv-2819 TLN DB (PC). (Plummer, M)
October 31, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Amended Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Gary Francis Fisher. (Plummer, M)
October 31, 2018 Filing 3 AMENDED PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/3/2018 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Plummer, M)
October 29, 2018 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, RTS: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider sent to Sonny Barger II. Notice of Change of Address due by 1/7/2019. (Reader, L)
October 23, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Sonny Barger II. (Huang, H)
October 23, 2018 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Huang, H)
October 22, 2018 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against California by Sonny Barger, II.(Huang, H)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Fisher v. California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonny Barger, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Francis Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?