(PC) Muhammad v. Seibel
Plaintiff: Kwesi Muhammad
Defendant: Kimberly Seibel and Robert Burton
Case Number: 2:2018cv02831
Filed: October 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Kwesi Muhammad. (Coll, A)
November 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Correctional Training Facility, P.O. Box 689, Soledad, CA, 93960-0689 by Kwesi Muhammad. (Coll, A)
November 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02831, 2:18-cv-02665 by Robert Burton. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vong, Steven)
October 30, 2018 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Kwesi Muhammad. (Yin, K)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 11/26/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Zignago, K.)
October 23, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from San Joaquin County Superior Court, case number STK-CV-2018-11217 by R. Burton. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7932700) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proof of Service)(Vong, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Muhammad v. Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kwesi Muhammad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kimberly Seibel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Burton
Represented By: Steven Edward Vong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?