Cooley v. California Statewide Law Enforcement Association et al

Plaintiff: Terry C. Cooley
Defendant: Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, Eric Banks, California Statewide Law Enforcement Association, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow and California Association of Law Enforcement Employees
Petitioner: William D. Brice
Case Number: 2:2018cv02961
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Allison Claire
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 27 OPPOSITION by Defendants to #8 Motion for Expedited Discovery. Attorney Kolkey, Christopher Miles added. (Kolkey, Christopher) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 8, 2019 Filing 26 STATEMENT of No Position Regarding Plaintiff's Motion for Expedited Discovery by Defendants re #8 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Onyeagbako, Maureen) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 8, 2019 Filing 25 OPPOSITION by State Defendants to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Attorney Onyeagbako, Maureen C. added. (Onyeagbako, Maureen) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 8, 2019 Filing 24 OPPOSITION by Defendants to #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Kasey Clark, #2 Declaration of Ken Fair)(Ferrannini, Cassandra) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
January 5, 2019 Filing 23 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Eric Banks on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Xavier Becerra on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Edmund G. Brown on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Arthur A. Krantz on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Erich Shiners on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019; Priscilla Winslow on 12/11/2018, Answer due 2/11/2019 (Mitchell, Jonathan)
January 3, 2019 Filing 22 MOTION to DISMISS by California Association of Law Enforcement Employees, California Statewide Law Enforcement Association. Motion Hearing set for 2/19/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Notice)(Ferrannini, Cassandra)
December 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NON-RELATED CASE ORDER signed by District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. on 12/19/18 re #20 Notice of Related Case: 2:18-cv-2230 MCE CKD and 2:18-cv-2961 JAM AC are NOT related (cc: MCE). (Benson, A.)
December 7, 2018 Filing 20 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-03106, 2:18-cv-02419, 2:18-cv-02574, 2:18-cv-02230 by William D. Brice. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Cooley v CSLEA)(Burlingham, Steven)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 12/3/2018 GRANTING plaintiff's request to redact or seal complaint. The Court orders that the redacted complaint submitted as Exhibit 1 to the plaintiff's Notice of Request to Redact Complaint or to Seal Complaint be substituted for the version of the Complaint that he filed on 11/13/2018. (Zignago, K.)
December 2, 2018 Filing 17 AMENDED NOTICE of MOTION for Expedited Discovery by Terry C. Cooley. Motion Hearing set for 1/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 26 (AC) before Magistrate Judge Allison Claire. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Zignago, K.).
November 30, 2018 Filing 16 NOTICE of Request to Seal Document(s) pursuant to L.R. 141 by Terry C. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 30, 2018 Filing 15 STIPULATION Re Extending Time to File Responsive Pleading by California Association of Law Enforcement Employees, California Statewide Law Enforcement Association. Attorney Ferrannini, Cassandra M. added. (Ferrannini, Cassandra) Modified on 12/3/2018 (Zignago, K.).
November 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER signed by Senior Judge William B. Shubb on 11/19/18 DECLINING to Relate cases 2:18-cv-02419-WBS-EFB and 2:18-cv-02961-JAM-AC. (Coll, A)
November 14, 2018 Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiffs motion for expedited discovery #8 is inappropriately noticed to be heard on January 22, 2019 before Judge Mendez, and as a consequence will not be calendared for hearing on that date. Counsel is advised that all discovery motions are to be heard by the assigned Magistrate Judge (see Local Rule 302). The assigned Magistrate Judge in this matter is the Hon. Allison Claire. Counsel will need to contact her clerk, Ms. Valerie Callen to obtain an available hearing date to re-notice the motion. Ms. Vallen can be reached at 916-930-4199 or via email at: vcallen@caed.uscourts.gov (TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by District Judge John A. Mendez on 11/14/2018 GRANTING #5 Application as to Attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV to represent Terry C. Cooley. (York, M)
November 14, 2018 Filing 11 MEMORANDUM by Terry C. Cooley in SUPPORT of #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 14, 2018 Filing 10 NOTICE of RELATED CASE 2:18-cv-02419-WBS-EFB by Terry C. Cooley. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 19 REDACTED COMPLAINT against all Defendants by Terry C. Cooley. (Zignago, K.)
November 13, 2018 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM by Terry C. Cooley in support of #8 Motion for Expedited Discovery. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for EXPEDITED DISCOVERY by Terry C. Cooley. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM by Terry C. Cooley in support of #6 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 6 MOTION for PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Terry C. Cooley. Motion Hearing set for 1/22/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 6 (JAM) before District Judge John A. Mendez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
November 13, 2018 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Terry C. Cooley for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit [see #2 for payment])(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 11/14/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 13, 2018 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Eric Banks, Xavier Becerra, Edmund G. Brown, California Association of Law Enforcement Employees, California Statewide Law Enforcement Association, Arthur A. Krantz, Erich Shiners, Priscilla Winslow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Bradley A. Benbrook* *Benbrook Law Group* *400 Capitol Mall, Suite 2530* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 13, 2018 Filing 2 [DISREGARD - NOT SIGNED - SEE #5 ] PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Terry C. Cooley for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-7965369) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan) Modified on 11/14/2018 (Benson, A.).
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 [SEALED pursuant to #18 Order] COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Terry C. Cooley. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7964801) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Benbrook, Bradley) Modified on 12/4/2018 (Zignago, K.).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cooley v. California Statewide Law Enforcement Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xavier Becerra
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edmund G. Brown
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Banks
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Statewide Law Enforcement Association
Represented By: Cassandra M. Ferrannini
Represented By: Christopher Miles Kolkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arthur A. Krantz
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erich Shiners
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Priscilla Winslow
Represented By: Maureen C. Onyeagbako
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Association of Law Enforcement Employees
Represented By: Cassandra M. Ferrannini
Represented By: Christopher Miles Kolkey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry C. Cooley
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: William D. Brice
Represented By: Steven R. Burlingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?