Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC et al v. Morrow et al
Petitioner: West Maui Resort Partners, L.P. and Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Respondent: Ileana Morrow and John Morrow
Case Number: 2:2018cv02970
Filed: November 13, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Mendez
Referring Judge: Kendall J Newman
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 9:9
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Petitioners to Petition to Confirm the Arbitration Award re #1 . Attorney Osborn, Blake L. added. (Osborn, Blake) Modified on 1/10/2019 (Mena-Sanchez, L).
December 24, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: John Morrow served on 11/20/2018 (Osborn, Blake) Modified on 12/26/2018 (York, M).
December 24, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Ileana Morrow served on 11/22/2018. (Osborn, Blake) Modified on 12/26/2018 (York, M).
November 14, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to *Ileana Morrow, John Morrow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James H. Turken* *1875 Century Park East* *Suite 1850* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Washington, S)
November 14, 2018 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 VDRP) (Becknal, R)
November 14, 2018 Filing 2 [SUMMONS RE-ISSUED see #4 ] SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Ileana Morrow, John Morrow* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *James H. Turken* *Dickstein Shapiro LLP* *2049 Century Park East, Suite 700* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Becknal, R) Modified on 11/14/2018 (Washington, S).
November 13, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION to Confirm Arbitration Award against Ileana Morrow, John Morrow by Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC, West Maui Resort Partners, L.P.. Attorney Turken, James H. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7966084) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Turken, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC et al v. Morrow et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: West Maui Resort Partners, L.P.
Represented By: James H. Turken
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Diamond Resorts Hawaii Collection Development, LLC
Represented By: James H. Turken
Represented By: Blake L. Osborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ileana Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Morrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?