(HC) Azevedo v. The People
Petitioner: Alex Leonard Azevedo
Respondent: The People
Case Number: 2:2018cv03005
Filed: November 19, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Morrison C England
Referring Judge: Gregory G Hollows
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Tracy State Prison, 23500 Kasson Road, Tracy by Alex Leonard Azevedo (Reader, L)
January 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Tracy State Prison, 23500 Kasson Road, Tracy by Alex Leonard Azevedo (Reader, L)
January 7, 2019 MAIL RETURNED as Undeliverable, Refused, Unable to Forward: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations sent to Alex Leonard Azevedo. Notice of Change of Address due by 3/18/2019. (Kastilahn, A)
January 7, 2019 RE-SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order, Findings and Recommendations re-served on Alex Leonard Azevedo at DVI. (Yin, K)
January 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to DVI 23500 Kasson Road, Tracy CA 95304 by Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
December 21, 2018 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR STATUS by Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Huang, H)
December 18, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order and Findings and Recommendations served on Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Huang, H)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER and FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS signed by Magistrate Judge Gregory G. Hollows on 12/18/2018 ORDERING the Clerk to assign a district judge to this case, GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP, and RECOMMENDING that #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus be dismissed without prejudice, and that the Clerk of the Court shall close the file. District Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. has been assigned. The case number for all future documents shall be: 2:18-cv-03005-MCE-GGH (HC). Referred to Judge Morrison C. England, Jr. Objections within 21 days after being served with these findings and recommendations. (Huang, H)
December 3, 2018 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR STATUS by Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Reader, L)(Response sent: "The Clerk's Office will provide copies of documents and of the docket sheet at $0.50 per page.") Modified on 12/5/2018 (Plummer, M).
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 CONSENT to JURISDICTION of US MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Benson, A.)
November 20, 2018 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Coll, A)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 12/24/2018. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent) (Coll, A)
November 19, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Alex Leonard Azevedo. (Coll, A)
November 19, 2018 Filing 1 PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against The People by Alex Leonard Azevedo.(Coll, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Azevedo v. The People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alex Leonard Azevedo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: The People
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?