(SS) Black v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Ashley Marie Paige Black
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2018cv03022
Filed: November 20, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Deborah Barnes
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 4/18/2019 (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Reader, L)
January 14, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jesse S. Kaplan* *Attorney at Law* *5441 Fair Oaks Blvd., Suite C-1* *Carmichael, California 95608*. (Reader, L)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Deborah Barnes on 1/13/2019 GRANTING #3 Plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis. The Clerk of the Court is directed to issue process and to serve upon plaintiff the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment for social security cases. The Clerk of the Court is further directed to serve a copy of this order upon the United States Marshal. Within 14 days from the date of this order, plaintiff shall submit to the USM a completed summons, a completed USM-285 form, sufficient copies of the summons and complaint for service of process in accordance with FRCP 4(i), and sufficient copies of the Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment issued in this case. Within 5 days after submitting the necessary documents to the USM for service or process, plaintiff shall file in this court a declaration stating the date on which the documents were submitted to the USM. The USM is directed to serve process and copies of the undersigned's Scheduling Order and Order re Consent or Request for Reassignment without prepayment of costs not later than 60 days from the date of this order. (Reader, L)
November 21, 2018 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Action Required. (Kaminski, H)
November 20, 2018 Filing 3 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Ashley Marie Paige Black. (Kaplan, Jesse)
November 20, 2018 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Ashley Marie Paige Black (Kaplan, Jesse)
November 20, 2018 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Ashley Marie Paige Black. Attorney Kaplan, Jesse S. added.(Kaplan, Jesse)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Black v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ashley Marie Paige Black
Represented By: Jesse S. Kaplan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?