Sream, Inc. et al v. Khinda et al
Plaintiff: RooR International BV and Sream, Inc.
Defendant: Rajwinder Khinda and Kashmir Khinda
Case Number: 2:2018cv03059
Filed: November 26, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Edmund F Brennan
Referring Judge: John A Mendez
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. (Vakil, Imran)
December 17, 2018 Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER: The court has been advised by Imran Vakil, counsel for plaintiff, that this action has been settled, Therefore, it is not necessary that the action remain upon the court's active calendar. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED: 1. That counsel file settlement/dismissal documents, in accordance with the provisions of Local Rule 160, no later than January 25, 2018; and 2. That any hearing dates previously set in this matter are vacated.(TEXT ENTRY ONLY) (Vine, H)
December 17, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by RooR International BV, Sream, Inc.. Dispositional Docs due by 1/22/2019. (Vakil, Imran)
December 4, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Rajwinder Khinda served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Vakil, Imran)
December 4, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Kashmir Khinda served on 11/30/2018, answer due 12/21/2018. (Vakil, Imran)
November 27, 2018 Filing 3 TRADEMARK NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED as to Trademark #1:* 2,235,638 * * 3/30/1999 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #2:* 2,307,176 * * 1/11/2000 * * Martin Birzle * Trademark #3:* 3,675,839 * * 9/1/2009 * * Martin Birzle * ; (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 Order re Filing Requirements, #3 Trademark Report, #4 VDRP) (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 27, 2018 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Kashmir Khinda, Rajwinder Khinda* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Imran F. Vakil* *Nexio PC* *245 Fischer Avenue Suite C3* *Costa Mesa, CA 92626*. (Mena-Sanchez, L)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kashmir Khinda, Rajwinder Khinda by Sream, Inc., RooR International BV. Attorney Vakil, Imran F. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-7985462) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Vakil, Imran)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sream, Inc. et al v. Khinda et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RooR International BV
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sream, Inc.
Represented By: Imran F. Vakil
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rajwinder Khinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kashmir Khinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?